Docket for 18-259
|
Jul 20 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 1, 2018) | | PetitionPetitionPetitionPetition | Sep 13 2018 | Application to Stay Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals to Justice Elena Kagan of City of East Cleveland, et al. not accepted for filing. (September 24, 2018) | | | Oct 17 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018. | | | Nov 05 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|