Docket for 18-1520
|
Mar 20 2019 | Application (18A956) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 7, 2019 to June 6, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Mar 22 2019 | Application (18A956) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 6, 2019. | | | Jun 04 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 8, 2019) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 13 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent Commissioner of Internal Revenue to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jun 19 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. | | | Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|