Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1509
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1509
Title:Department of Homeland Security, et al., Petitioners
v.
Rahinah Ibrahim
Docketed:June 4, 2019
Linked with 18A954
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-16161, 14-17272)
   Decision Date:January 2, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 22 2019Application (18A954) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 2, 2019 to May 2, 2019, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. (Justice Kagan is recused.)
Mar 25 2019Application (18A954) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until May 2, 2019.
Apr 19 2019Application (18A954) to extend further the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 2, 2019 to May 31, 2019, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Written RequestProof of Service
Apr 22 2019Application (18A954) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until May 31, 2019.
May 31 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 5, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jun 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 5, 2019 to August 5, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 5, 2019.
Aug 05 2019Brief of respondent Rahinah Ibrahim in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5600
Party name: Rahinah Ibrahim

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543