Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1501
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1501
Title:Charles C. Liu, et al., Petitioners
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission
Docketed:June 3, 2019
Linked with 18A958
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-55849)
   Decision Date:October 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:January 3, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 22 2019Application (18A958) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 3, 2019 to May 31, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 22 2019Application (18A958) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 31, 2019.
May 31 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 3, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 13 2019Waiver of right of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jul 05 2019Response Requested. (Due August 5, 2019)
Jul 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 5, 2019 to September 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 4, 2019.
Sep 04 2019Brief of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Sep 18 2019Reply of petitioners Charles C. Liu, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2019Rescheduled.
Oct 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Nov 01 2019Petition GRANTED.
Nov 19 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Charles C. Liu, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Nov 26 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 3, 2020.
Dec 16 2019Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief of petitioners Charles C. Liu, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Oak Management Corporation in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Andy Altahawi filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2019Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Dec 23 2019Brief amici curiae of Parker R. Hallam and Frederick A. Voight filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of The New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2019Brief amici curiae of Remedies and Restitution Scholars in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jan 09 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Jan 09 2020The record of the USCA 9th Circuit is available on PACER. Sealed record material of the USDC Central District of California received electronically.
Jan 15 2020Brief of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Federal Trade Commission Officials filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Securities Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2020CIRCULATED
Jan 21 2020Brief amici curiae of State of Illinois, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Better Markets, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of North American Securities Administrators Association, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Commissioners and Staff of the Securities and Exchange Commission filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2020Reply of petitioners Charles C. Liu, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2020Argued. For petitioners: Gregory G. Rapawy, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Malcolm L. Stewart, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.
Jun 22 2020Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Sotomayor, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Ginsburg, Breyer, Alito, Kagan, Gorsuch, and Kavanaugh, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael K. Kellogg
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

mkellogg@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7902
Party name: Charles C. Liu, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Securities and Exchange Commission
Other
Bradley Joseph Bondi
    Counsel of Record
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
1990 K Street, N.W.
Suite 950
Washington, DC 20006

bbondi@cahill.com
202.862.8910
Party name: Cato Institute
Donald Burke
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP
2000 K St NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

dburke@robbinsrussell.com
202-775-4491
Party name: Law Professors
Daniel Patrick Chiplock
    Counsel of Record
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
250 Hudson Street
New York, NY 10013

DCHIPLOCK@lchb.com
(212) 355-9500
Party name: Former Commissioners and Staff of the Securities and Exchange Commission
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Cause of Action Institute
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

cynthia.crawford@causeofaction.org
2024992421
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Michael John Dell
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel, LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

mdell@kramerlevin.com
212-715-9129
Party name: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association
Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
    Counsel of Record
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
88 Pine Street. 14th Floor
New York, NY 10005

meisenkraft@cohenmilstein.com
212-838-0177
Party name: North American Securities Administrators Association, Inc.
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Members of Congress
Robert G. Heim
    Counsel of Record
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
1350 Broadway
New York, NY 10018

rheim@tarterkrinsky.com
(212) 216-1131
Party name: Andy Altahawi
Dennis Michael Kelleher
    Counsel of Record
Better Markets, Inc.
1825 K Street, NW
Suite 1080
Washington, DC 20006

jgrimes@bettermarkets.com
(202) 618-6464
Party name: Better Markets, Inc.; Center for Responsible Lending; National Consumer Law Center
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

mkimberly@mwe.com
(202) 756-8901
Party name: Oak Management Corporation
Harold Douglas Laycock
    Counsel of Record
Michigan State University College of Law
648 N. Shaw Lane
East Lansing, MI 48824

DLAYCOCK@VIRGINIA.EDU
512-656-1789
Party name: Remedies and Restitution Scholars
Sidney Michael McColloch
    Counsel of Record
S. Michael McColloch, PLLC
3131 McKinney Avenue, Suite 600
Dallas, TX 75204

smm@mccolloch-law.com
2146741868
Party name: Parker R. Hallam and Frederick A. Voight
Donna M. Nagy
    Counsel of Record
Indiana University Maurer School of Law
211 South Indiana Avenue
Bloomington, IN 47405

dnagy@indiana.edu
8122194150
Party name: Securities Law Professors
Jane Elinor Notz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Illinois
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

jnotz@atg.state.il.us
312-814-5376
Party name: State of Illinois
John Pagliaro
    Counsel of Record
The New England Legal Foundation
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111

johnpagliaro@nelfonline.org
617-695-3660
Party name: New England Legal Foundation
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
John Julian Vecchione
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St. NW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20006

john.vecchione@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
2026744412
Party name: The New Civil Liberties Alliance
David Charney Vladeck
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown Law School
600 New Jersey Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

vladeckd@law.georgetown.edu
202-662-9540
Party name: Former Federal Trade Commission Officials

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543