Docket for 18-1158 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 10 2018 | Application (18A601) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 3, 2019 to March 4, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main Document | Dec 11 2018 | Application (18A601) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 4, 2019. | | | Mar 04 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2019) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 26 2019 | Brief of Jefferson S. Dunn in opposition not accepted for filing. (April 09, 2019 -- Corrected version to be submitted) | | | Mar 26 2019 | Brief of respondent Jefferson S. Dunn in opposition filed.(4/11/ 2019) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 04 2019 | Amicus brief of Federal Defenders for the Middle District of Alabama not accepted for filing. (April 09, 2019 -- Corrected version to be submitted) | | | Apr 04 2019 | Brief amici curiae of Federal Defenders for the Middle District of Alabama, Inc., et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 09 2019 | Reply of petitioner Jarrod Taylor filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 17 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019. | | | May 13 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|