SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-1133
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-1133
Title:
Henry J. Langer, et ux., Petitioners
v.
Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Docketed:
March 1, 2019
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(17-3682)
Decision Date:
September 18, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
November 27, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 25 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 1, 2019)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 22 2019
Waiver of right of respondent CIR to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 27 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Apr 15 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Henry J. Langer
7101 Antrim Court
Edina, MN 55439
Party name: Henry Langer, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: CIR
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##