SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-1132 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-1132 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Oscar Franklin Smith, Petitioner
v.
Tony Mays, Warden
Docketed:
March 1, 2019
Linked with 18A764
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-5133)
Decision Date:
August 22, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
October 31, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 18 2019
Application (18A764) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 29, 2019 to February 28, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Jan 28 2019
Application (18A764) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 28, 2019.
Feb 28 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 1, 2019)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 12 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2019 to May 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 15 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 1, 2019.
May 01 2019
Brief of respondent Tony Mays in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 21 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
May 21 2019
Reply of petitioner Oscar Franklin Smith filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jun 10 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric F. Citron
Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814
ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Oscar Franklin Smith
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael M. Stahl
Counsel of Record
Office of the Tennessee Attorney General
Tennessee Attorney General's Office
500 Charlotte Ave.
Nashville, TN 37243
michael.stahl@ag.tn.gov
615-253-5463
Party name: Tony Mays
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##