Docket for 18-113 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 23 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 24, 2018) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 17 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 24, 2018 to October 8, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Aug 21 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 9, 2018. | | | Aug 24 2018 | Brief amici curiae of Florida Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and Florida Center for Capital Representation at Florida International University College of Law filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 08 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 9, 2018 to October 19, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 10 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 19, 2018. | | | Oct 19 2018 | Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 06 2018 | Reply of petitioner Jeremiah Rodgers filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 07 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018. | | | Dec 03 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|