Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1027
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1027
Title:Superior Communications, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Voltstar Technologies, Inc.
Docketed:February 6, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2093)
   Decision Date:November 6, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 04 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 8, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Mar 21 2019Response Requested. (Due April 22, 2019)
Apr 16 2019Motion of Voltstar Technologies, Inc. for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (April 18, 2019 -- Corrected version to be submitted)
Apr 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2019 to May 14, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 14, 2019.
May 14 2019Brief of respondent Voltstar Technologies, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 23 2019Reply of petitioner Superior Communications, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Martin Jacobs
    Counsel of Record
Snell & Wilmer LLP
One South Church Avenue
400 East Van Buren Street, Ste. 1900
Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

ajacobs@swlaw.com
602-382-6300
Party name: Superior Communications, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Geyser P.C.
One Energy Square
4925 Greenville Ave., Ste. 200
Dallas, TX 75206

daniel.geyser@geyserpc.com
214-800-2660
Party name: Voltstar Technologies, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543