Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17A1287
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17A1287
Title:Jorge F. Acevedo, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:May 21, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(17-0224)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 26 2018Application (17A1287) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 7, 2018 to July 6, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
May 22 2018Application (17A1287) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 6, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543