Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-988
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-988
Title:Lamps Plus, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Frank Varela
Docketed:January 11, 2018
Linked with 17A577
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-56085)
   Decision Date:August 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 11, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2017Application (17A577) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 10, 2017 to January 10, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 28 2017Application (17A577) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until January 10, 2018.
Jan 10 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 12, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 12, 2018 to March 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 14, 2018.
Feb 12 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 14 2018Brief of respondent Frank Varela in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Mar 28 2018Reply of petitioners Lamps Plus, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 30 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jun 04 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 9, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 30, 2018.
Jul 09 2018Brief of petitioners Lamps Plus, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 09 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 13 2018Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2018Brief amicus curiae of DRI–The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of Center for Workplace Compliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, October 29 2018
Aug 30 2018Brief of respondent Frank Varela filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2018Brief amici curiae of Contract Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Sep 12 2018CIRCULATED
Oct 01 2018Reply of petitioners Lamps Plus, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2018Argued. For petitioners: Andrew J. Pincus, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Michele M. Vercoski, Ontario, Cal.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Andrew J. Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3220
Party name: Lamps Plus, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Michele M. Vercoski
    Counsel of Record
McCune Wright Arevalo
3281 E. Guasti Road, Suite 100
Ontario, CA 91761

mmv@mccunewright.com
909-557-1250
Party name: Frank Varela
Other
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park, PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States America
John Richard Annand
    Counsel of Record
NT Lakis, LLP
1501 M Street, NW Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

jannand@ntlakis.com
2026295617
Party name: Center for Workplace Compliance
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: American Association for Justice
Mary Massaron
    Counsel of Record
Plunkett & Cooney, P.C.
38505 Woodward Ave
Suite 100
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

mmassaron@plunkettcooney.com
313-983-4801
Party name: DRI–The Voice of the Defense Bar
Benjamin G. Robbins
    Counsel of Record
New England Legal Foundation
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111-2504

benrobbins@nelfonline.org
8577727620
Party name: New England Legal Foundation
Matthew Adam Seligman
    Counsel of Record
Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law
55 Fifth Avenue
Room 933
New York, NY 10023

matthew.seligman@yu.edu
2127900349
Party name: Contract Law Scholars
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543