Docket for 17-976
|
Jan 09 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2018) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountAppendixProof of Service | Jan 17 2018 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, CTIA - The Wireless Association. | | Blanket Consent | Jan 18 2018 | Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, City of Berkeley, et al.. | | Blanket Consent | Jan 19 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent City of Berkeley to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 24 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018. | | | Jan 30 2018 | Response Requested. (Due March 1, 2018) | | | Jan 30 2018 | Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute, Competitive Enterprise Institute, and Cause of Action Institute filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 06 2018 | Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 08 2018 | Brief amici curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc., et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 08 2018 | Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 08 2018 | Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 22 2018 | Brief amicus curiae of Association of National Advertisers, Inc. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 23 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 1, 2018 to March 31, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 23 2018 | Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 27 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 2, 2018. | | | Feb 27 2018 | Brief amici curiae of Institute for Justice and National Federation of Independent Business filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 02 2018 | Brief of respondents City of Berkeley, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 17 2018 | Reply of petitioner CTIA - The Wireless Association filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 18 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018. | | | Jun 27 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018. | | | Jun 28 2018 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of National Institute of Family and Life Advocates v. Becerra, 585 U. S. ____ (2018). | | | Jul 30 2018 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|