SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-9570 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-9570 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Mark Allen Davis, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
June 26, 2018
Linked with 17A1167
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC17-1259)
Decision Date:
January 29, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 19 2018
Application (17A1167) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 29, 2018 to June 28, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Apr 24 2018
Application (17A1167) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 28, 2018.
Jun 25 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 26, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Jul 25 2018
Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Aug 09 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Linda McDermott
Counsel of Record
McClain & McDermott, P.A.
20301 Grande Oak Blvd.
Suite 118-61
Estero, FL 33928
lindammcdermott@msn.com
8503222172
Party name: Mark Davis
Attorneys for Respondent
Doris Meacham
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
444 Seabreeze., 5TH FLOOR
Daytona Beach, FL 32118
doris.meacham@myfloridalegal.com
3862384990
Party name: Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##