Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9467 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9467 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Larry Lamont White, Petitioner
v.
Kentucky
Docketed:June 21, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Kentucky
   Case Numbers:(2014-SC-000725-MR)
   Decision Date:March 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 18 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 23, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceOther
Jul 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 23, 2018 to August 23, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 23, 2018.
Aug 23 2018Brief of respondent Commonwealth of Kentucky in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 06 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 18 2018Record Requested.
Oct 04 2018Record received from the Supreme Court of Kentucky (1 box).
Oct 22 2018Reply to Brief in Opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Nov 06 2018Record received from the Jefferson County Circuit Court (1 box).
Nov 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Dec 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kathleen Kallaher Schmidt
    Counsel of Record
Department of Public Advocacy
5 Mill Creek Park, Suite 100
Frankfort, KY 40601

kathleen.schmidt@ky.gov
5025648006
Party name: Larry Lamont White

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543