SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-9449 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-9449 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Luzenski Allen Cottrell, Petitioner
v.
South Carolina
Docketed:
June 19, 2018
Linked with 17A1143
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of South Carolina
Case Numbers:
(27754)
Decision Date:
December 20, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
February 16, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 17 2018
Application (17A1143) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 17, 2018 to June 18, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 19 2018
Application (17A1143) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 18, 2018.
Jun 15 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 19, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
Jul 19 2018
Brief of respondent South Carolina in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Aug 02 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 20 2018
Reply of petitioner Luzenski Allen Cottrell filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Oct 01 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Keir Michael Weyble
Counsel of Record
Clinical Professor of Law
Cornell University Law School
158 Hughes Hall
Ithaca, NY 14853
kw346@cornell.edu
6072553805
Party name: Luzenski Allen Cottrell
Attorneys for Respondent
Melody Jane Brown
Counsel of Record
South Carolina Attorney General's Office
Post Office Box 11549
Columbia, SC 29211
mbrown@scag.gov
803-734-3742
Party name: South Carolina
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##