Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9221
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9221
Title:Donovan Letrell Hall, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 5, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-4487)
   Decision Date:February 28, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 29 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 5, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 5, 2018 to August 6, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 6, 2018.
Aug 03 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 21 2019Letter from counsel for petitioner not accepted for filing. (Duplicate submission -- June 21, 2019)
Jun 21 2019Letter from counsel for petitioner received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Rehaif v. United States, 588 U. S. ___ (2019).
Jul 30 2019JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jaclyn Lee DiLauro
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Federal Public Defender
Eastern District of North Carolina
150 Fayetteville St., Suite 450
Raleigh, NC 27601

jackie_dilauro@fd.org
919-857-9066
Party name: Donovan Hall
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543