Docket for 17-916
|
Nov 13 2017 | Application (17A565) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 27, 2017 to December 27, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main Document | Nov 21 2017 | Application (17A565) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 27, 2017. | | | Dec 27 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 29, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 05 2018 | Waiver of right of respondents Commission on Presidential Debates; F. Fahrenkopf, Jr.; M. McCurry to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 09 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent Willard Mitt Romney to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 10 2018 | Waiver of right of respondents Democratic National Committee; Barack Obama to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 10 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent Republican National Committee to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 17 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018. | | | Feb 20 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|