Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9100
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9100
Title:Noah Kleinman, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 25, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-50585)
   Decision Date:January 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 25, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceOther
Jun 04 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jun 21 2018Amicus brief of Fully Informed Jury Association submitted.
Main Document
Jun 22 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Fully Informed Jury Association. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Becky Walker James
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Gross LLP
601 S. Figueroa Street
30th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017

bjames@ggtriallaw.com
(213) 334-7000
Party name: Noah Kleinman
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543