SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-8407
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-8407
Title:
Bryan Joseph Mincey, Petitioner
v.
Ron Davis, Warden
Docketed:
April 6, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(15-56264)
Decision Date:
October 26, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 17 2017
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 7, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Apr 18 2018
Waiver of right of respondent Ron Davis to respond filed.
Main Document
May 02 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018
Petition DENIED.
Oct 01 2018
Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main Document
Oct 03 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018
Rehearing DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Bryan Mincey
D-09104
San Quentin State Prison
San Quentin, CA 94974
Party name: Bryan Joseph Mincey
Attorneys for Respondent
Meredith S. White
Counsel of Record
California Office of the Attorney General
600 W. Broadway, Suite 1800
San Diego, CA 92101
meredith.white@doj.ca.gov
619-738-9069
Party name: Ron Davis
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##