SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-8188 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-8188 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Scott Group, Petitioner
v.
Norm Robinson, Warden
Docketed:
March 23, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(16-3726)
Decision Date:
May 25, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
December 21, 2017
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 19 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 23, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Apr 05 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 23, 2018 to May 23, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 10 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 23, 2018.
May 22 2018
Brief of respondent Norm Robinson, Warden in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 04 2018
Reply of petitioner Scott Group filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 06 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph Edmond Wilhelm
Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender, ND Ohio
1660 West Second Street
Suite 750
Cleveland, OH 44113
joseph_wilhelm@fd.org
216-522-4856
Party name: Scott Group
Attorneys for Respondent
Eric E. Murphy
Counsel of Record
Ohio State Solicitor
30 East Broad Street
17th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215
eric.murphy@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
614-466-8980
Party name: Norm Robinson, Warden
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##