Docket for 17-8046 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Mar 06 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 9, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis | Mar 16 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 9, 2018 to May 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 29 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 7, 2018. | | | May 04 2018 | Brief of respondent Secretary, Florida Department of Cirrections in opposition filed. | | Main Document | May 23 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018. | | | Jun 11 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|