Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7973
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7973
Title:Roosevelt W., et ux., Petitioners
v.
Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services
Docketed:March 5, 2018
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B277764)
   Decision Date:July 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 21, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:October 18, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 28 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 4, 2018)
Apr 04 2018Waiver of right of respondent Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 30 2018Petition DENIED.
May 25 2018Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main Document
Jul 12 2018DISTRIBUTED.
Aug 06 2018Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Roosevelt Williams Jr.3655 Oak Grove Road
Monroeville, AL 36460

Party name: Roosevelt W., et ux.
Attorneys for Respondent
Doraine Faye Meyer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the County Counsel
350 S Figueroa St Suite 601
Los Angeles, CA 90012

dmeyer@counsel.lacounty.gov
213-974-0065
Party name: Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543