SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-7853 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-7853 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Chadwick Willacy, Petitioner
v.
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:
February 21, 2018
Linked with 17A583
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(14-13797-P)
Decision Date:
July 12, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
September 19, 2017
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 15 2017
Application (17A583) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 18, 2017 to February 16, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Nov 28 2017
Application (17A583) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 16, 2018.
Feb 15 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 23, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Appendix
Appendix
Appendix
Appendix
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Mar 23 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 23, 2018 to March 28, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 28 2018
Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Mar 30 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 28, 2018.
Apr 12 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 30 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Linda McDermott
Counsel of Record
McClain & McDermott, P.A.
20301 Grande Oak Blvd.
Suite 118-61
Estero, FL 33928
lindammcdermott@msn.com
8503222172
Party name: Chadwick Willacy
Attorneys for Respondents
Lisa-Marie Krause Lerner
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1515 N. Flagler Dr.
9th Floor
West Palm Beach, FL 33401
Lisamarie.lerner@myfloridalegal.com
5678375000
Party name: State of Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##