Docket for 17-775 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 21 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 28, 2017) | | PetitionProof of Service | Dec 22 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 28, 2017 to January 29, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 28 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 29, 2018. | | | Jan 29 2018 | Brief of respondent State of Alabama in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 09 2018 | Reply of petitioner Jeffery Lee filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 14 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018. | | | Feb 26 2018 | Record Requested. | | | Mar 12 2018 | Record received from the Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama. The record is electronic. | | | Mar 13 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018. | | | Apr 02 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|