Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7716
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7716
Title:Daniel K. Garcia, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 8, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-11952)
   Decision Date:July 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 31, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 29 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 12, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Mar 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 12, 2018 to April 11, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 11, 2018.
Apr 11 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 17 2018Reply of petitioner Daniel Garcia filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Apr 25 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Megan Jean Saillant
    Counsel of Record
101 SE 2nd Place
Suite 112
Gainesville, FL 32601

megan_saillant@fd.org
352-373-5823
Party name: Daniel Garcia
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543