Docket for 17-7603 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 25 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 1, 2018) | | Petition | Feb 27 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 1, 2018 to March 31, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 01 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 2, 2018. | | | Apr 02 2018 | Brief of respondent The State of Texas in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 19 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018. | | | May 14 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|