SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-7546 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-7546 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Gregory Lance Henderson, Petitioner
v.
Alabama
Docketed:
January 25, 2018
Linked with 17A610
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama
Case Numbers:
(CR-12-0043)
Decision Date:
February 10, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
May 26, 2017
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
September 22, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 28 2017
Application (17A610) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 21, 2017 to January 20, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Dec 07 2017
Application (17A610) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 20, 2018.
Jan 22 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 26, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Other
Proof of Service
Feb 22 2018
Brief of respondent State of Alabama in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Mar 06 2018
Reply of petitioner Gregory Henderson filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Mar 08 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Angela Leigh Setzer
Counsel of Record
Equal Justice Initiative
122 Commerce Street
Montgomery, AL 36104
asetzer@eji.org
3342691803
Party name: Gregory Henderson
Attorneys for Respondent
James Roy Houts
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 3000152
Montgomery, AL 36130-0152
jhouts@ago.state.al.us
3343531513
Party name: State of Alabama
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##