Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7321
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7321
Title:Peter T. Roukis, Petitioner
v.
Department of the Army
Docketed:January 8, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(18-0005/AR)
   Decision Date:October 19, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 27 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 7, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceAppendix
Jan 19 2018Waiver of right of respondent Department of the Army to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 25 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Peter Roukis#17364045
U.S.P. Tucson
P.O. Box 24550
Tucson, AZ 85734

Party name: Peter T. Roukis
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of the Army

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543