Docket for 17-7257 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Oct 19 2017 | Application (17A451) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 30, 2017 to December 29, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy. | | | Oct 24 2017 | Application (17A451) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until December 29, 2017. | | | Dec 29 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 2, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Feb 02 2018 | Brief of respondent Charles L. Ryan, Arizonoa Department of Corrections in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 22 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018. | | | Mar 19 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|