Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-7233
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-7233
Title:Gerquan Bernard Belton, Petitioner
v.
Ohio
Docketed:January 2, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Ohio
   Case Numbers:(2016-1270)
   Decision Date:September 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 1, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jan 11 2018Waiver of right of respondent State of Ohio to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 13 2018Response Requested. (Due March 15, 2018)
Mar 13 2018Brief of respondent State of Ohio in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 11 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 18 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 27 2018Rescheduled.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 09 2018Rescheduled.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 29 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Charlyn Eileen Bohland
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Ohio Public Defender
250 East Broad Street, Suite 1400
Columbus, OH 43215

charlyn.bohland@opd.ohio.gov
6144665394
Party name: Gerquan Belton
Attorneys for Respondent
Ronald W. Springman Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Hamilton County Prosecutor's Office
230 East Ninth Street
Suite 4000
Cincinnati, OH 45202

ron.springman@hcpros.org
513-946-3052
Party name: State of Ohio

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543