Docket for 17-7099 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 12 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 16, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service | Jan 12 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 16, 2018 to February 15, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 18 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 15, 2018. | | | Feb 15 2018 | Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Mar 01 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018. | | | Mar 01 2018 | Reply of petitioner Richard Knight filed. (Distributed) | | Main Document | Mar 19 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | | Jan 16 2018 | Motion of State of Florida for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (January 18, 2018) | | |
|