SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-7045 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-7045 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Daniel Clate Acker, Petitioner
v.
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:
December 14, 2017
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(16-70017)
Decision Date:
August 14, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
September 13, 2017
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 11 2017
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 16, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
Dec 20 2017
Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 16, 2018 to February 15, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 22 2017
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 15, 2018.
Feb 09 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 15, 2018 to March 15, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 12 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 15, 2018.
Mar 15 2018
Brief of respondent Lorie Davis in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 22 2018
Reply of petitioner Daniel Clate Acker filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 29 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allen Richard Ellis
Counsel of Record
Law Office of A. Richard Ellis
75 Magee Avenue
Mill Valley, CA 94941-4532
a.r.ellis@att.net
415-389-6771
Party name: Daniel Clate Acker
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##