Docket for 17-6938 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 08 2017 | Application (17A276) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 25, 2017 to November 24, 2017, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. | | | Sep 12 2017 | Application (17A276) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until November 24, 2017. | | | Nov 22 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 2, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServicePetitionAppendix | Dec 15 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 2, 2018 to February 1, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 20 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 1, 2018 | | | Feb 01 2018 | Brief of respondent State of Missouri in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 14 2018 | Reply of petitioner Michael Tisius filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 15 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018. | | | Mar 05 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|