Aug 11 2017 | Application (17A182) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 29, 2017 to October 28, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
| |
Aug 16 2017 | Application (17A182) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 28, 2017. |
| |
Oct 27 2017 | Motion (17M60) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed. |
| |
Oct 27 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 27, 2017) |
| |
Nov 01 2017 | MOTION (17M60) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017. |
| |
Nov 27 2017 | Motion (17M60) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record Granted. |
| |
Dec 27 2017 | Brief of respondent South Carolina in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentOtherProof of Service |
Jan 11 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018. |
| |
Jan 11 2018 | Reply of petitioner filed. (Distributed) |
| |
Feb 20 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
| |