Docket for 17-6838 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 08 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 18, 2017) | | | Dec 13 2017 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOtherOther | Dec 28 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018. | | | Jan 16 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|