Docket for 17-6796 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 22 2017 | Application (17A222) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 13, 2017 to November 12, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | | Aug 28 2017 | Application (17A222) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until November 12, 2017. | | | Nov 13 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 15, 2017) | | PetitionProof of ServiceMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisAppendix | Dec 15 2017 | Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Jan 03 2018 | Reply of petitioner Juan David Rodriguez filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 04 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018. | | | Jan 22 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|