Docket for 17-6514 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 18 2017 | Application (17A211) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 30, 2017 to October 29, 2017, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. | | | Aug 22 2017 | Application (17A211) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until September 29, 2017. | | | Sep 29 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 29, 2017) | | | Nov 07 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 29, 2017. | | | Nov 27 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 29, 2017 to January 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 30 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 26, 2018. | | | Jan 26 2018 | Brief of respondent Arkansas in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 15 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018. | | | Mar 05 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|