Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-651
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-651
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Douglas D. Jackson
Docketed:November 2, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3693)
   Decision Date:August 4, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 4, 2017)
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Dec 22 2017Response Requested. (Due January 22, 2018)
Jan 22 2018Brief of respondent Douglas D. Jackson in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 07 2018Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 19 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner United States filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 23 2018Supplemental brief of respondent Douglas D. Jackson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).
Jun 15 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
David Michael Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Bluhm Legal Clinic, Northwestern Univ. Law School
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 60611

david.shapiro@law.northwestern.edu
312-503-0711
Party name: Douglas D. Jackson

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543