Docket for 17-6446 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Oct 19 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 24, 2017) | | | Nov 20 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 24, 2017 to December 8, 2017, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 30 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 8, 2017. | | | Dec 07 2017 | Brief of respondent State of Louisiana in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 21 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018. | | | Jan 08 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|