Docket for 17-6405 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 06 2017 | Application (17A263) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 18, 2017 to October 18, 2017, submitted to Justice Alito. | | | Sep 08 2017 | Application (17A263) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 18, 2017. | | | Oct 17 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 20, 2017) | | | Nov 17 2017 | Brief of respondent Davis, Dir. TX DCJ in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 29 2017 | Reply of petitioner Christopher Young filed. | | Main Document | Dec 07 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018. | | | Jan 08 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|