Docket for 17-6397 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jun 21 2017 | Application (16A1265) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 17, 2017 to October 16, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | | Jul 03 2017 | Application (16A1265) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 16, 2017. | | | Oct 13 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 17, 2017) | | | Oct 26 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 18, 2017. | | | Dec 18 2017 | Brief of respondent State of Alabama in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceOtherOtherOther | Jan 02 2018 | Reply of petitioner Michael Brandon Kelley filed. (Distributed) | | Main Document | Jan 04 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018. | | | Jan 22 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|