Docket for 17-6383 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 21 2017 | Application (17A155) to extend the time to file a petition for rehearing from August 16, 2017 to October 15, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | | Aug 14 2017 | Application (17A155) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 15, 2017. | | | Oct 12 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 15, 2017) | | | Nov 06 2017 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. | | | Nov 21 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017. | | | Nov 29 2017 | Reply of petitioner Matthew Caylor filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 11 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|