Docket for 17-6382 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 14 2017 | Application (17A187) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 17, 2017 to October 16, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | | Aug 18 2017 | Application (17A187) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 16, 2017. | | | Oct 16 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 17, 2017) | | | Nov 28 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 17, 2017 to December 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 29 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 18, 2018. | | | Dec 18 2017 | Brief of respondent State of Alabama in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Jan 04 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018. | | | Jan 22 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|