Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-6340
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-6340
Title:Keishan H. Enix, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 12, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-11716-J)
   Decision Date:July 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 10 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 13, 2017)
Nov 13 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Mar 06 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Keishan H. Enix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 08 2018Second supplemental brief of petitioner Keishan Benjamin Enix filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).
Jun 15 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Conrad B. Kahn
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender's Office
201 South Orange Ave., Suite 300
Orlando, FL 32801

Conrad_Kahn@fd.org
(407) 648-6338
Party name: Keishan Benjamin Enix
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543