Docket for 17-6329 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 11 2017 | Application (17A62) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 12, 2017 to September 10, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | | Jul 18 2017 | Application (17A62) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 10, 2017. | | | Sep 07 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 13, 2017) | | | Nov 09 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 13, 2017. | | | Dec 13 2017 | Brief of respondents Florida, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Dec 28 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018. | | | Jan 16 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|