Docket for 17-6237 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 30 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 3, 2017) | | | Oct 30 2017 | Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. | | | Nov 15 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017. | | | Dec 04 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|