Docket for 17-6162 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 25 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 30, 2017) | | | Oct 27 2017 | Brief of respondent Missouri in opposition filed. | | | Nov 09 2017 | Reply of petitioner Brian Dorsey filed. | | | Nov 15 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017. | | | Dec 04 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|