Docket for 17-6127 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 25 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 27, 2017) | | | Oct 26 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 27, 2017. | | | Nov 27 2017 | Brief of respondent Davis, Dir., TX DCJ in opposition filed. | | Proof of ServiceMain Document | Dec 13 2017 | Reply of petitioner Joseph Prystash filed. (Distributed) | | Proof of ServiceMain Document | Dec 14 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018. | | | Jan 08 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|