Docket for 17-5939 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 05 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 11, 2017) | | | Oct 11 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2017. | | | Nov 13 2017 | Brief of respondent Arizona in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOtherOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 30 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018. | | | Dec 18 2017 | Reply of petitioner Darrel P. Pandeli filed. (Distributed) | | Main Document | Jan 08 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|