Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-587
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-587
Title:Mount Lemmon Fire District, Petitioner
v.
John Guido, et al.
Docketed:October 19, 2017
Linked with 17A226
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15030)
   Decision Date:June 19, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 25 2017Application (17A226) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 17, 2017 to October 18, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Aug 30 2017Application (17A226) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until October 18, 2017.
Oct 18 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 20, 2017)
Nov 08 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 18, 2017.
Dec 18 2017Brief of respondents John Guido, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2018Reply of petitioner Mount Lemmon Fire District filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Feb 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018Petition GRANTED.
Mar 23 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Mount Lemmon Fire District.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 23 2018Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Mar 26 2018Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 7, 2018. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 5, 2018.
Apr 06 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, John Guido, et al.
Blanket Consent
Apr 16 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
May 04 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Mount Lemmon Fire District.
Blanket Consent
May 07 2018Brief of petitioner Mount Lemmon Fire District filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2018Brief amici curiae of National Conference of State Legislatures, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 05 2018Brief of respondents John Guido, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 09 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT On Monday, October 1, 2018
Jul 12 2018Brief amici curiae of AARP, AARP Foundation and NELA filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 12 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 03 2018CIRCULATED
Aug 06 2018Reply of petitioner Mount Lemmon Fire District filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 07 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Aug 24 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Aug 30 2018Record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Oct 01 2018Argued. For petitioner: E. Joshua Rosenkranz, New York, N. Y. For respondents: Jeffrey L. Fisher, Stanford, Cal.; and Jonathan C. Bond, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5000
Party name: Mount Lemmon Fire District
Attorneys for Respondents
Don T. Awerkamp
    Counsel of Record
Awerkamp & Bonilla, PLC
6891 N. Oracle Road, Suite 155
Tucson, AZ 85704

da@abdilaw.com
(520) 798-5282
Party name: John Guido, et al.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Daniel Benjamin Kohrman
    Counsel of Record
AARP Foundation
601 E Street, NW
Washington, DC 20049

dkohrman@aarp.org
202-434-2064
Party name: AARP, AARP Foundation and NELA
Collin O'Connor Udell
    Counsel of Record
Jackson Lewis P.C.
90 State House Square, 8th Floor
Hartford, CT 06103-3708

collin.udell@jacksonlewis.com
8605220404
Party name: NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF STATE LEGISLATURES, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543